This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 00:41:34 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS BELLA VISTA APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BELLA VISTA APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1573

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

SCHINDLER ELEVATOR

MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT

BELLA VISTA APARTMENTS

MCCORMACK BARON SALAZAR INC .

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARBAGALLO WILLIAM BRADLEY

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

JEBREIL RYAN W.

RAMSEY LARRY

WATERKOTTE GRANT

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

5/13/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Substitution of Attorney

3/28/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

4/19/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/4/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/10/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/10/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

11/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

12/10/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

9/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/27/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Cross-Complaint

8/28/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/28/2020: Answer

Answer

8/17/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/15/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES); Filed by Schindler Elevator (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by McCormack Baron Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Schindler Elevator (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Action); Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLA VISTA APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where MCCORMACK BARON SALAZAR INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant