This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 06:32:31 (UTC).

ZENAIDA QUEVEDO VS CITY OF BELL GARDENS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 ZENAIDA QUEVEDO filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF BELL GARDENS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5030

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUEVEDO ZENAIDA

Defendants

CITY OF BELL GARDENS

WEI CHUAN INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESLAMBOLY-HAKIM SHARONA

Defendant Attorneys

BARBER JOHN COCHRANE

BERGSTEN ROBERT TROY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/26/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

12/15/2022: Answer

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

1/6/2023: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Answer

1/6/2023: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2/9/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2024
  • Hearing09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/05/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Wei Chuan International Inc. (Defendant); As to: Zenaida Quevedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Wei Chuan International Inc. (Defendant); As to: Zenaida Quevedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: Wei Chuan International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of Bell Gardens (Defendant); As to: Zenaida Quevedo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zenaida Quevedo (Plaintiff); As to: City of Bell Gardens (Defendant); Wei Chuan International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zenaida Quevedo (Plaintiff); As to: City of Bell Gardens (Defendant); Wei Chuan International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zenaida Quevedo (Plaintiff); As to: City of Bell Gardens (Defendant); Wei Chuan International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less