This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 15:16:45 (UTC).

ZENA TYLER VS UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 ZENA TYLER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2259

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER ZENA

Defendants

FRITZ PETRA

POLKA SUZANNE

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIPELES KEVIN A.

SCHELLY THOMAS H.

Defendant Attorneys

JENKINS HALEH R.

BARBER JOHN L.

TURNER ANNE M.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KERRY CLINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KERRY CLINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Separate Statement

5/26/2023: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/26/2023: Motion for Summary Judgment

Exhibit List

5/26/2023: Exhibit List

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADRIANA OVALLE STEVENSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADRIANA OVALLE STEVENSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT SALAZAR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT SALAZAR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETRA FRITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETRA FRITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HALEH R. JENKINS IN SUPPORT OF THE REGENTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HALEH R. JENKINS IN SUPPORT OF THE REGENTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/24/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/11/2023: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (4TH)

4/5/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (4TH)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/04/2023

4/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/04/2023

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER

4/4/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)

11/10/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE THE THIRD A...)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE THE THIRD A...)

Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/9/2022: Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California, erroneously sued as University of California (Non-Party); As to: Zena Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF HALEH R. JENKINS IN SUPPORT OF THE REGENTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California, erroneously sued as University of California (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF KERRY CLINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California, erroneously sued as University of California (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF ROBERT SALAZAR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California, erroneously sued as University of California (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF PETRA FRITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California, erroneously sued as University of California (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Zena Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Zena Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Zena Tyler (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanne Polka (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/05/2020; Service Cost: 66.67; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Zena Tyler (Plaintiff); As to: Petra Fritz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/05/2020; Service Cost: 39.77; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Transfer In Case Documents Register of Actions: Status Date changed from 06/15/2021 to 10/23/2020; Name Extension: Register of Actions; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 06/15/2021 to 10/23/2020; As To Parties changed from Suzanne Polka (Defendant), University of California (Defendant), Petra Fritz (Defendant) to University of California (Defendant), Suzanne Polka (Defendant), Petra Fritz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 06/15/2021 to 10/23/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less