This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 05:01:35 (UTC).

ZELAYA, ALFREDO VS WINTER, JASMINE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 ZELAYA, ALFREDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WINTER, JASMINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SANTOS, M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0640

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SANTOS, M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZELAYA ALFREDO

Respondent

WINTER JASMINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROWN SAMUEL ROBERT

Respondent Attorneys

KIM CAROLINE S

WINTERS JONATHAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/20/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

4/20/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Summons

4/16/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/16/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/16/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Proof of Service of Summons

6/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Rejection - FL-115 POS of Summons rcd 6/09/21

6/10/2021: Notice - Rejection - FL-115 POS of Summons rcd 6/09/21

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/4/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/3/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

8/3/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Substitution of Attorney

7/7/2021: Substitution of Attorney

RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - RFO/MTN - Spousal Support

5/23/2022: RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - RFO/MTN - Spousal Support

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

5/23/2022: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Objection - Objection and Request to Strike

6/28/2022: Objection - Objection and Request to Strike

Minute Order

7/12/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010

7/11/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

10/17/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 123, Santos, M., Presiding; RFO - Spousal Support - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERS JONATHAN D. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM CAROLINE S