This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2020 at 06:28:50 (UTC).

ZEFERINO DE LOYA-CASTRO VS CESAR DURAZO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ZEFERINO DE LOYA-CASTRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR DURAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7678

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOYA-CASTRO ZEFERINO DE

Defendants and Respondents

OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

DURAZO CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

THE DOMINGUEZ FIRM INC.

SUAREZ RODRIGO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILLIAMSON JOHN S. ESQ.

WILLIAMSON JOHN S.ESQ.

WILLIAMSON JOHN SCHENCK III

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

10/17/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS, OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. AND CESAR DURAZO FOR AN ORDER FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FO

10/21/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS, OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. AND CESAR DURAZO FOR AN ORDER FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FO

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/21/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL DAT...)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL DAT...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL DATE OR,

1/17/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC AND TRIAL DATE OR,

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 06/19/2020

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 06/19/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

6/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 06/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

9/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order continuing Final...)

3/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order continuing Final...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

3/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Notice of Ruling

3/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application OF DEFENDANTS, OLD DOMINION F...)

1/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application OF DEFENDANTS, OLD DOMINION F...)

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel To Comply with Deposition Subpoena to Appear and Produce Documents and Things and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $4,743.60

2/13/2019: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel To Comply with Deposition Subpoena to Appear and Produce Documents and Things and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $4,743.60

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • Hearing01/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Hearing01/06/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Failure to Prosecute) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 11:54 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...) of 08/25/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:17 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Cesar Durazo (Defendant); Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cesar Durazo (Defendant); Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Zeferino De Loya-Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Zeferino De Loya-Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zeferino De Loya-Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC677678    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ZEFERINO DE LOYO-CASTRO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CESAR DURAZO, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC677678

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 14, 2019

The parties participated in an IDC on 10/21/19. At the conclusion of the IDC, the parties indicated all issues had been resolved. Plaintiff has not, to date, taken the MTCF off calendar. The Court takes the motion off calendar as moot, and asks the parties to ensure they promptly use the online reservation system to take matters off calendar when they are moot, in order to avoid the unnecessary use of court resources on such matters. Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.