This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 05:33:09 (UTC).

ZE YOU ZHENG VS JOHN HUANG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 ZE YOU ZHENG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN HUANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5765

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHENG ZE YOU

Defendants

SHD DESSERT LLC

HUANG JOHN

JA COLIMA DESSERT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTAGEN ROBERT S.

Defendant Attorneys

DAO LOAN THI

REN SIJIU

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE RE: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

9/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE RE: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Answer

6/23/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/26/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS)

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS) OF 06/09/2021

6/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS) OF 06/09/2021

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/10/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/10/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIJIU REN RE: MEET AND CONFER

5/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIJIU REN RE: MEET AND CONFER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIJIU REN RE: MEET AND CONFER

5/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIJIU REN RE: MEET AND CONFER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/10/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service - No Service

5/10/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/10/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Undertaking

4/29/2021: Undertaking

Notice - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE ORDER TO POST BOND

4/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE ORDER TO POST BOND

Order - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION REQUESTING PLAINTIFF TO POST A BOND

4/16/2021: Order - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION REQUESTING PLAINTIFF TO POST A BOND

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (RE: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by John Huang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John Huang (Defendant); SHD DESSERT LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ze You Zheng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALTAGEN ROBERT S. ESQ.