This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 18:41:57 (UTC).

ZARRO, ARIA - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 ZARRO, ARIA - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0633

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORBIN-ZARRO ASHLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/1/2021: Minute Order

Proposed Order

4/1/2021: Proposed Order

Declaration - Declaration of Urgency

4/2/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Urgency

Ex Parte - Application - [No Date Indicated] Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time

4/2/2021: Ex Parte - Application - [No Date Indicated] Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time

Proposed Order - Ex Parte - [Proposed] Ex Parte Order for Order Shortening Time

4/2/2021: Proposed Order - Ex Parte - [Proposed] Ex Parte Order for Order Shortening Time

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

4/6/2021: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Minute Order

3/16/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Minor Compromise Hearing

3/18/2021: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Minor Compromise Hearing

Ex Parte - Order

2/16/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Application - no date indicated-EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: (1) AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE AND (2) AN ORDER APPOINTING GAL

2/10/2021: Ex Parte - Application - no date indicated-EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: (1) AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE AND (2) AN ORDER APPOINTING GAL

Petition - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/10/2021: Petition - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Proposed Order - Ex Parte - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

2/10/2021: Proposed Order - Ex Parte - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF PETITIONER???S EX PARTE APPLICATION

2/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF PETITIONER???S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATIONS OF URGENCY

2/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATIONS OF URGENCY

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order Approving Compromise of Claim for Minor

1/27/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order Approving Compromise of Claim for Minor

Rejected Proposed Order

2/3/2021: Rejected Proposed Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

2/3/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

1/25/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 11:00 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application ([No Date Indicated] Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Urgency ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (no date indicated-EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: (1) AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE AND (2) AN ORDER APPOINTING GAL ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF PETITIONER???S EX PARTE APPLICATION ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATIONS OF URGENCY ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE