This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 02:23:39 (UTC).

ZAREH AVEDIS HAGOPIAN VS WI SPA, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 ZAREH AVEDIS HAGOPIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WI SPA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5365

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAGOPIAN ZAREH AVEDIS

Defendant

WI SPA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zareh Avedis Hagopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zareh Avedis Hagopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zareh Avedis Hagopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN