This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 13:25:43 (UTC).

ZAKIYA SUN ELLIS VS B&V ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA SUPER KING MARKETS

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 ZAKIYA SUN ELLIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0587

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIS ZAKIYA SUN

Defendant

B&V ENTERPRISES INC. DBA SUPER KING MARKETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

SWEISS HANNAH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Related Case

7/16/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HARRY ERGANYAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

8/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HARRY ERGANYAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Related Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Mail

5/13/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF HARRY ERGANYAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE); Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by B&V Enterprises, Inc. Dba Super King Markets (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zakiya Sun Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&V ENTERPRISES INC. DBA SUPER KING MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN