This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 23:07:37 (UTC).

ZAGROS INVESTMENT, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS USMAN KHALID, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 ZAGROS INVESTMENT, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against USMAN KHALID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7230

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZAGROS INVESTMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ZAGROS INVESTMENT LLC

Defendants

KHALID USMAN

KHAN FARRAH NAZ

THE CHICKEN GUYS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

QURESHI IMRAN AKHTAR

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

THE CHICKEN GUYS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESHMIRI KAVEH

Defendant Attorneys

JAFARI CHRISTOPHER K. JAFARI

BATEZEL MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/4/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/4/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE

8/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE

Notice of Ruling

7/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER N DEFENDANT KHALID, AKHTAR, KHANS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

7/20/2021: Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER N DEFENDANT KHALID, AKHTAR, KHANS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO C...)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO C...)

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/9/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

7/9/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 430.41(A)(2)

7/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 430.41(A)(2)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 435.5 (A)(2)

6/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 435.5 (A)(2)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Complaint; Filed by Defendants Usman Khalid, Imran Akhtar Qureshi, Farrah Naz Khan;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Usman Khalid (Defendant); Imran Akhtar Qureshi (Defendant); Farrah Naz Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (- Court's ORDER n Defendant Khalid, Akhtar, Khan?s Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketReply (Defendants' joint reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint); Filed by Usman Khalid (Defendant); Imran Akhtar Qureshi (Defendant); Farrah Naz Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MATTHEW F. BATEZEL RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 435.5 (a)(2)); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zagros Investment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZAGROS INVESTMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant