This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2023 at 10:38:12 (UTC).

ZACHARY A. ROSENBERG VS 949 WEST ADAMS BLVD HOLDINGS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ZACHARY A ROSENBERG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 949 WEST ADAMS BLVD HOLDINGS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4828

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSENBERG ZACHARY A.

Defendant

949 WEST ADAMS BLVD HOLDINGS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUFF DAVID MICHAEL

WEISS KARYNNE G.

Defendant Attorney

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/1/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

2/10/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement

3/20/2023: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2023: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Zachary A. Rosenberg (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Zachary A. Rosenberg on 11/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Zachary A. Rosenberg as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Zachary A. Rosenberg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should not be Imposed due to Defendants Failure to Appear at the Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should not be Imposed due to Defendants Failure to Appear at the Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/03/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Zachary A. Rosenberg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zachary A. Rosenberg (Plaintiff); As to: 949 West Adams Blvd Holdings, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zachary A. Rosenberg (Plaintiff); As to: 949 West Adams Blvd Holdings, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zachary A. Rosenberg (Plaintiff); As to: 949 West Adams Blvd Holdings, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 36 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less