Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 19:18:03 (UTC).

ZA-ZEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, ET AL. VS GRUBHUB INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 ZA-ZEN ENTERPRISES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GRUBHUB INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3874

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZA-ZEN ENTERPRISES LLC

ZA-ZEN ENTERPRISES LLC DBA SHIBUMI

Defendant

GRUBHUB INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OUTWATER ALEX MARTIN

TODZO MARK N

 

Court Documents

Notice - DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

5/18/2021: Notice - DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/24/2021

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/24/2021

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

4/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 04/26/2021

4/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 04/26/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 11:30 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDefendant Grubhub INC.'s notice of filing of notice of removal of action; Filed by Grubhub Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:14 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) of 04/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Za-Zen Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Za-Zen Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Za-Zen Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TODZO, MARK N.