This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 02:13:42 (UTC).

Z POOLED TRUST SUB-ACCOUNT FBO MARY WOODBURN

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 Z POOLED TRUST SUB-ACCOUNT FBO MARY WOODBURN was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3958

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Z FOUNDATION

Not Classified By Court

Z POOLED TRUST SUB-ACCOUNT FBO MARY WOODBURN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMON JOEL MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

5/2/2017: Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

9/20/2018: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

7/23/2018: Notice - Hearing

Account - Trust (Subsequent) - Verified First Account

7/11/2018: Account - Trust (Subsequent) - Verified First Account

Miscellaneous Document - Proof of Bond

8/30/2017: Miscellaneous Document - Proof of Bond

Declaration - Declaration in Support of Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs

7/11/2018: Declaration - Declaration in Support of Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs

Inventory & Appraisal - - Final

9/8/2017: Inventory & Appraisal - - Final

Order - Order Approving Verified First Account

10/17/2018: Order - Order Approving Verified First Account

Notice - Hearing

7/13/2018: Notice - Hearing

Supplement - Supplement to First Account Current and Report of Trustee

9/13/2018: Supplement - Supplement to First Account Current and Report of Trustee

Declaration - Declaration for Increase of Bond

9/8/2017: Declaration - Declaration for Increase of Bond

Order - Order For Increase of Bond

9/14/2017: Order - Order For Increase of Bond

Proof of Service - Proof of Service of Order

10/19/2018: Proof of Service - Proof of Service of Order

Bond - US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

9/7/2017: Bond - US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service of Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Order (Order Approving Verified First Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Supplement (Supplement to First Account Current and Report of Trustee ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Account - Trust (Subsequent) (Verified First Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Declaration (Declaration in Support of Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Order (Order For Increase of Bond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Declaration (Declaration for Increase of Bond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Inventory & Appraisal (- Final ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Bond (US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Miscellaneous Document (Proof of Bond )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less