This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 01:34:00 (UTC).

YVONNE ZAVALA VS STEVE KARLAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 YVONNE ZAVALA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVE KARLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2778

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ZAVALA YVONNE

Respondents and Defendants

ISEN DAVID

DOES 1 TO 10

KARLAN STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SETAREH DANIEL ESQ.

ABRON BYRON JACOB ESQ.

ABRON BYRON ESQ.

SETAREH DANIEL OMID ESQ.

SIMON BRANDON J. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

FARMER CASE HACK & FEDOR

FARMER JOHN T. ESQ.`

FARMER JOHN T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Witness List

5/12/2021: Witness List

Exhibit List

5/12/2021: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

4/19/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Proof of Service by Mail

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT DAVID ISENS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

4/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT DAVID ISENS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BYRON J. ABRON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

4/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BYRON J. ABRON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH DEFENDANT DAVID ISEN'S 04/13/2021 LATE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT DESIGNATION

4/19/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH DEFENDANT DAVID ISEN'S 04/13/2021 LATE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT DESIGNATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH...) OF 04/20/2021

4/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH...) OF 04/20/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH...)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOYCE R. DONDANVILLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ISENS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

3/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOYCE R. DONDANVILLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ISENS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT DAVID ISENS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

3/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT DAVID ISENS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF. DECLARATION OF PAUL F. ARENTZ. EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/10/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF. DECLARATION OF PAUL F. ARENTZ. EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (BC692778 - ZAVALA V. KARLAN, ...) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (BC692778 - ZAVALA V. KARLAN, ...) OF 03/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (BC692778 - ZAVALA V. KARLAN, ...)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (BC692778 - ZAVALA V. KARLAN, ...)

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT ISEN'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/15/2021: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT ISEN'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Declaration - DECLARATION BYRON J. ABRON DECL. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION BYRON J. ABRON DECL. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS. BC692778 (ZAVALA ...)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS. BC692778 (ZAVALA ...)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate (Case Nos. BC692778 (Zavala vs. Karlan, et. al.) and 20STCV39937 (Zavala vs. Cavanaugh, et. al.), Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 1048 , and California Rules of Court, Rules 3.1332(c) and (d) , Filed by Plaintiff) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial (estimated at 7 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Yvonne Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by Yvonne Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Protective Order to Quash Defendant David Isen's 04/13/2021 Late Supplemental Expert Designation, Filed by Plaintiff (Related to 20STCV39937)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Protective Order to Quash...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) ((3-months trial cont)); Filed by David Isen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by David Isen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Isen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT DAVID ISEN TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yvonne Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yvonne Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692778    Hearing Date: March 23, 2021    Dept: 29

Yvonne Zavala v. Steve Karlan, et al.

Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Case Numbers BC692778 (Zavala  v.  Karlan et. al.) and 20STCV39937 (Zavala  v.  Cavanaugh et. al.)

TENTATIVE

Plaintiff’s Motion is DENIED.   

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Legal Standard

Code Civ. Proc., § 1048, subd. (a) states, “[w]hen actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1048, subd. (a); see also Spector v. Superior Court (1961) 55 Cal.2d 839, 844 [Two actions that present essentially the same, or overlapping, issues should be consolidated and disposed of as a single proceeding].)   

Consolidation, however, is not a matter of right; it rests solely within the sound discretion of the trial judge. (Fisher v. Nash Bldg. Co. (1952) 113 Cal.App.2d 397, 402.)¿ Actions may be thoroughly “related” in the sense of having common questions of law or fact, and still not be “consolidated,” if the trial court, in the sound exercise of its discretion, chooses not to do so.¿ (Askew v. Askew (1994) 22 Cal.App.4th 942, 964.)¿ It is not abuse of discretion to deny motion for consolidation of actions where parties in each action are different or issues are different.¿ (See Muller v. Robinson (1959) 174 Cal App 2d 511, 515.)¿ On the other hand, actions may be consolidated in the discretion of the trial court whenever it can be done without prejudice to a substantial right.¿ (Carpenson v. Najarian (1967) 254 Cal.App.2d 856, 862.)

In deciding whether to grant a motion to consolidate, the court should weigh whether the common issues predominate over the individual issues and whether any risks of jury confusion or prejudice to the parties outweighs the reduction in time and expense that would result from consolidation.  (Todd-Stenberg v. Shield (1996) 48 Cal.App.4th 976, 978.) 

Discussion

Conclusion

Thus, Plaintiff’s Motion is DENIED.  

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARMER JOHN