This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2023 at 07:02:44 (UTC).

YVONNE NIETO VS AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 YVONNE NIETO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9265

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIETO YVONNE

Defendant

AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK YOUNG KOOK

Defendant Attorney

MINIOZA JOSEPH J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/24/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/24/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/9/2023: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/9/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/5/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

9/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/30/2022

8/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/30/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON; APPENDIX A THERETO

8/30/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON; APPENDIX A THERETO

Case Management Statement

7/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/13/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by YVONNE NIETO on 02/21/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by YVONNE NIETO as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (7-10 Day Estimate) scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Order [PROPOSED] ORDER; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant); Service Cost: 147.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: YVONNE NIETO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN JEWISH UNIVERSITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less