This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 23:44:24 (UTC).

YVETTE V. MOSES VS ISABEL G. SAINZ

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 YVETTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOSES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2880

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSES YVETTE V.

Defendant

SAINZ ISABEL G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WON HELEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2024
  • Hearing09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by YVETTE V. MOSES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YVETTE V. MOSES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YVETTE V. MOSES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YVETTE V. MOSES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WON HELEN ESQ.