Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2019 at 00:03:54 (UTC).

YVETTE REYES VS JOE EDWARD ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 YVETTE REYES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOE EDWARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9178

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REYES YVETTE

Defendants and Respondents

ENTERPRISE HOLDING INC

ENTERPRISE FLEET MANAGEMENT INC

HHC COUNSTRUCTION

ENTERPRISE VEHICLE MANAGEMENT II LLC

HHS CONSTRUCTION INC

EDWARD JOE

ENTERPRISE FM TRUST LSR

HHS INC

DOES 1 TO 200

COUNSTRUCTION HHC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BROWN ALAN C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GHAEMI DORDANEH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

4/4/2018: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/4/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

10/11/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE

10/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by YVETTE REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice; Filed by HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC (Defendant); HHC COUNSTRUCTION (Defendant); HHS INC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Answer; Filed by JOE EDWARD (Defendant); HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC (Defendant); HHC COUNSTRUCTION (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC (Defendant); HHC COUNSTRUCTION (Defendant); HHS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by YVETTE REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by YVETTE REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by YVETTE REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HHS is a litigant

Latest cases where HHS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE FM TRUST INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Enterprise Fleet Management Inc. is a litigant