This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 19:24:53 (UTC).

YVETTE ALFARO VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CARE FOUNDATION

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 YVETTE ALFARO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CARE FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9599

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFARO YVETTE

Defendant

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CARE FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY MARCUS J.

Defendant Attorney

SIMMONS RICHARD JAY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

9/29/2020: Case Management Order

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

10/29/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

9/16/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF CAUSES OF ACTION ONE THROUGH FIVE

12/18/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF CAUSES OF ACTION ONE THROUGH FIVE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARCUS J. BRADLEY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CAUSES OF ACTION ONE THROUGH FIVE

11/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARCUS J. BRADLEY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CAUSES OF ACTION ONE THROUGH FIVE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/9/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Order - AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

9/29/2020: Order - AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2020, CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2020, CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE. INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER AND JUNE 30, 2020 MINUTE ORDER

7/13/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE. INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER AND JUNE 30, 2020 MINUTE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

6/30/2020: Initial Status Conference Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

Notice of Appearance

7/1/2020: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER)

6/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER) OF 06/30/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER) OF 06/30/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/22/2020: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Yvette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Dismissal of Causes of Action One Through Five); Filed by Yvette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling Responsive Pleading) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Responsive Pleading)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Marcus J. Bradley in Support of Request for Dismissal of Causes of Action One Through Five); Filed by Yvette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling Amended Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Amended Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 2:43 PM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order ((complex litigation program)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Initial Status Conference Order) of 06/30/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Initial Status Conference Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yvette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yvette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yvette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CARE FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY MARCUS J.