This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 01:04:59 (UTC).

YURY GEYLIKMAN VS. SOLARCITY CORPORATION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 YURY GEYLIKMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOLARCITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE, C. EDWARD SIMPSON and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7575

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GEYLIKMAN ANNA

GEYLIKMAN YURY

Defendants

SOLARCITY CORPORATION

A-1 AMERICAN ROOFING CO. INC.

TESLA ENERGY OPERATIONS INC.

A-1 ROOFING CO. INC.

TESLA ENERGY OPERATIONS INC. FKA SOLARCITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALEXANDER E. GILBURG

GILBURG ALEXANDER E.

GILBURG ALEXANDER EDWARD

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID R. SIDRAN

GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA

SIDRAN DAVID ROBERT

BARATTA JAMES MARK

SIDRAN DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUED TRIAL AND ALL RE...)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUED TRIAL AND ALL RE...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

9/24/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel DEFENDANT A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO. INC. 'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANNA GEYLIKMAN'S RESPONSES

1/22/2019: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel DEFENDANT A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO. INC. 'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANNA GEYLIKMAN'S RESPONSES

Notice of Ruling

1/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

1/2/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/31/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

1/4/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Opposition - Defendant A-1 All American Roofing Co. Inc's Opposition to Solar City's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Declaration of Kristen R. Rodriguez

10/29/2018: Opposition - Defendant A-1 All American Roofing Co. Inc's Opposition to Solar City's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Declaration of Kristen R. Rodriguez

Minute Order - Minute Order (Defendant Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. fka Solarcity Corpora...)

11/1/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Defendant Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. fka Solarcity Corpora...)

Notice - Notice Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

10/31/2017: Notice - Notice Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00

2/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint

2/16/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint

Answer

2/28/2018: Answer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel

6/7/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel

Request for Judicial Notice

9/26/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Instant Action)

11/9/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Instant Action)

Declaration -

9/26/2018: Declaration -

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • Hearing12/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Hearing11/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to Defendant A-1 Roofing Co. Inc.) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Status Conference (ReArbitration as to Defendants Solarcity Corporation and Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to Defendan...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 07/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Estimate5-7 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by YURY GEYLIKMAN (Plaintiff); ANNA GEYLIKMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketRequest (FOR COPIES OF COMPLAINT AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - 13 PAGES ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice (Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC067575    Hearing Date: November 22, 2019    Dept: E

DISCOVERY MOTIONS (2 Motions)

(CCP § 2030.290, 2031.300, 2033.280, 2023.010 et seq)

Date: 11/22/19

Case: Yury Geylikman, et al. v. Solarcity Corporation, et al. (EC 067575)

 

TENTATIVE RULING:

I. MOTION TO COMPEL

Defendant A-1 All American Roofing Co. Inc.’s UNOPPOSED Motion to Compel Plaintiffs’ Responses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents is GRANTED.

Plaintiff Anna Geylikman is ordered to serve responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two, and Special Interrogatories, Sets Two and Three, without objection, within 10 days. Plaintiff Anna Geylikman is further ordered to serve responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Two, without objection, and to permit inspection and copying, within 10 days.

Plaintiff Yury Geylikman is ordered to serve responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two, and Special Interrogatories, Sets Two and Three, without objection, within 10 days. Plaintiff Yury Geylikman is further ordered to serve responses to Request for Production of Documents, Sets Two and Three, without objection, and to permit inspection and copying, within 10 days.

II. MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Defendant A-1 All American Roofing Co. Inc.’s UNOPPOSED Motion for Admissions of Requests for Admissions is GRANTED.

Plaintiffs Yury Geylikman and Anna Geylikman have failed to serve timely responses substantially complying with the provisions of CCP § 2033.220 prior to the hearing on this motion. The Court therefore orders that all matters specified in Defendant A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc.’s Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Anna Geylikman (Set No. One) are deemed admitted as true, pursuant to CCP § 2033.280(c). The Court further orders that all matters specified in Defendant A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc.’s Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Yury Geylikman (Set No. One) are deemed admitted as true, pursuant to CCP § 2033.280(c).

III. REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

With respect to each motion, defendant requests monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,720. Confusingly, defendant submits nearly two identical declarations of Jessica McKennon, both of which, according to their captions, are purportedly submitted in support of both motions. (See 9/13/19 McKennon Decl. [filed 9/16/19]; 9/23/19 McKennon Decl. [filed 9/24/19].) The 9/13/19 McKennon declaration, however, states that it is submitted in support of the Motion to Compel, but then confusingly provides two amounts -- $1,540 and $1,720 – purportedly spent on the “instant motion” in “reasonable expenses and attorney’s fees.” (9/13/19 McKennon Decl. ¶¶ 1, 9.) Adding to the confusion, the 9/23/19 McKennon declaration states it is made in support of both motions and also confusingly provides two amounts -- $1,540 and $1,720 – purportedly spent on both of the “instant motions.” (9/23/19 McKennon Decl. ¶¶ 1, 10.) The Court also notes that both declarations claim a $60 expense for “Filing fees re: Motion for Protective Order,” where clearly no such motion is at issue here. (9/13/19 McKennon Decl. ¶ 9; 9/23/19 McKennon Decl. ¶ 10.) Compounding the confusion and calling further into question the reliability of either declaration, both declarations erroneously state that this Court previously granted defendant’s motions to compel on 5/17/19 and imposed sanctions of $2,220. (9/13/19 McKennon Decl. ¶ 8; 9/23/19 McKennon Decl. ¶ 9.) This Court, however, takes judicial notice of the fact that, on 5/17/19, the Court made no such ruling, because defendant had taken off calendar its motion to compel deposition scheduled to be heard that date. The Court notes, however, that on 4/5/19, the Court had granted defendant’s two motions to compel discovery and awarded sanctions of $1,110 as to each motion, for a total of $2,220.

Accordingly, considering the reasonable value of the instant, unopposed motions and associated costs, the Court hereby awards monetary sanctions in the amount of $675 (three attorney hours at $185 per hour, plus two $60 filing fees), against plaintiffs Yury Geylikman and Anna Geylikman, and plaintiffs’ attorney of record, jointly and severally, payable within 30 days. (CCP §§ 2030.290(c), 2031.300 (c), 2023.010(d), 2023.030(a), 2033.280(c).)