This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2020 at 01:17:51 (UTC).

YUMIKO RAFAEL ET AL VS JULIE RICHMOND

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 YUMIKO RAFAEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JULIE RICHMOND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4982

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RAFAEL YUMIKO

RAFAEL ADEL

Defendants and Respondents

RICHMOND JULIE

DOES 1 TO 15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSS STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

GLASSMAN NICOLE A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND FI...)

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND FI...)

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ADEL RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

5/19/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ADEL RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING PLAINTIFF YUMIKO RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

5/19/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING PLAINTIFF YUMIKO RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

5/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...) OF 05/20/2020

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...) OF 05/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF YUMIKO RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SAN

5/8/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF YUMIKO RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SAN

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ADEL RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS

5/8/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ADEL RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF YUMIKO RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS

5/8/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF YUMIKO RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ADEL RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS

5/8/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ADEL RAFAELS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE T...)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) OF 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) OF 04/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

Answer

12/17/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet - /Addendum

5/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - /Addendum

Summons -

5/4/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

5/4/2018: Complaint -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Hearing09/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (4-Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Adel Rafael?s Verified Responses To Form Interrogatories And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; 5-Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Yumiko Rafael?s Verified Responses To Special Interrogatories & monetary) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Serve and File Proof of Service) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (1- Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Yumiko Rafael?s Verified Responses To Demand For Inspection And Production Of Documents And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; 2-Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Adel Rafael?s Verified Responses To Form) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (3-Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Adel Rafael?s Verified Responses To Special Interrogatories And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; 4-Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Yumiko Rafael?s Verified Responses To Form Interrogatories & Monetary) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Plaintiffs Adel Rafael and Yumiko Rafael?s Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories.) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve and Fi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 09:16 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE T...) of 03/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Julie Richmond (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Julie Richmond (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yumiko Rafael (Plaintiff); Adel Rafael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Yumiko Rafael (Plaintiff); Adel Rafael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704982    Hearing Date: August 13, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

YUMIKO RAFAEL, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JULIE RICHMOND, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC704982

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

August 13, 2020

 

Defendant, Julie Richmond propounded (1) request for production of documents, (2) special interrogatories, and (3) form interrogatories on Plaintiff Yumiko Rafael (“Yumiko”) on 12/26/19. In addition, Defendant propounded (4) special interrogatories and (5) form interrogatories on Plaintiff Adel Rafael (“Adel”) on 12/26/19. To date, despite an attempt to meet and confer, Plaintiffs have not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiffs to respond, without objections, to the outstanding interrogatories and RPDs.

Defendant’s motions to compel are granted. Plaintiff Yumiko is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. Plaintiff Adel is ordered to serve responses to special interrogatories and form interrogatories, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c), 2033.280(c). Defendant requests sanctions of $585.25 for each of its five motions to compel. Defense counsel bills at the rate of $143.75/hour. The court awards one hour for each of the five form discovery motions. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. The court awards one hour to appear at this hearing, but awards this time only once. The court therefore awards a total of 6 hours of attorney time at the requested rate of $143.75, or $862.50 in attorneys’ fees. The Court also awards five filing fees of $60 each, or $300 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs’ attorney of record. However, Defendant does not identify any conduct by Plaintiffs warranting sanctions against them personally. Therefore, sanctions are imposed against Plaintiffs’ attorney of record only. Plaintiffs’ counsel is ordered to pay sanctions to Moving Defendant by and through its attorney of record, in the total amount of $1,162.50, within twenty days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 13th day of August, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court