This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2020 at 08:05:14 (UTC).

YULIA SEREZHKINA VS JOHN TR DE PAOLO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 YULIA SEREZHKINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOHN TR DE PAOLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7911

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEREZHKINA YULIA

Defendants

MOSS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. DBA MOSS & COMPANY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

14440 DICKENS LLC.[DOE 1]

TR DE PAOLO JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

WOOD CARY L. ESQ

EKMEKCHYAN ALIK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Case Management Statement

12/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

11/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 11/12/2019

11/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 11/12/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/12/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

11/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 11/04/2019

11/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 11/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...)

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/30/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

10/30/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT 14440 DICKENS, LLC. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

10/22/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT 14440 DICKENS, LLC. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT 14440 DICKENS, LLC. NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

10/22/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT 14440 DICKENS, LLC. NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

10/4/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

10/4/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Vladimir Serezhkin (Plaintiff); Yulia Serezhkina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Yulia Serezhkina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Moss Management Services, Inc. (Defendant); 14440 Dickens, LLC.[Doe 1] (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike); Filed by Moss Management Services, Inc. (Defendant); 14440 Dickens, LLC.[Doe 1] (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (Of Continued Hearing On Demurrer And Motion To Strike); Filed by Moss Management Services, Inc. (Defendant); 14440 Dickens, LLC.[Doe 1] (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (Of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Moss Management Services, Inc. (Defendant); 14440 Dickens, LLC.[Doe 1] (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Yulia Serezhkina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yulia Serezhkina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vladimir Serezhkin (Plaintiff); Yulia Serezhkina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 1941.1) ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7911    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 5

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

YULIA SEREZHKINA,

Plaintiff,

v.

JOHN TR DE PAOLO, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****7911

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 5 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred to THE NORTHWEST DISTRICT, JUDGE HUEY P. COTTON presiding in DEPT. A of the VAN NUYS Courthouse, for further assignment to an Independent Calendar Courtroom.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 4, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOSS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC DBA 4565 HAZELTINE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EKMEKCHYAN ALIK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD CARY L.