Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 15:12:44 (UTC).

YUCHEN HSIEH VS YING TAI TANG

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 YUCHEN HSIEH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YING TAI TANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2963

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSIEH YUCHEN

Defendant

TANG YING TAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIN HANS

Defendant Attorney

OAKLEY RANDAL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/27/2021: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/21/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/8/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer (AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by YuChen Hsieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YuChen Hsieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YuChen Hsieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YuChen Hsieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YuChen Hsieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YuChen Hsieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less