This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2022 at 08:31:42 (UTC).

YOVANA FERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS RONALD GEORGE LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 YOVANA FERNANDEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RONALD GEORGE LEE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3426

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FERNANDEZ YOVANA

ISAIAH EATON A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM YOVANA FERNANDEZ

Defendants

LEE RONALD GEORGE

VERREGGER DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL

Defendant Attorney

LEE JAMES

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

7/20/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR YOVANNA

7/28/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR YOVANNA

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

9/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

9/6/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2024
  • Hearing07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ronald George Lee (Defendant); Debra Verregger (Defendant); As to: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ronald George Lee (Defendant); Debra Verregger (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Ronald George Lee (Defendant); Debra Verregger (Defendant); As to: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Yovanna; Signed and Filed by: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Yovanna: Filed By: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff),Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald George Lee (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/25/2022; Service Cost: 84.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Debra Verregger (Defendant); Service Date: 07/23/2022; Service Cost: 84.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald George Lee (Defendant); Debra Verregger (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); Isaiah Eaton, a minor by and through his guardian ad litem, Yovana Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald George Lee (Defendant); Debra Verregger (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE JAMES