This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:46:00 (UTC).

YOUR WAY TREE SERVICE, INC., VS TRUE, INC., A NORTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 YOUR WAY TREE SERVICE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRUE, INC , A NORTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6927

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUR WAY TREE SERVICE INC.

Defendants

TRUE INC. A NORTH

AP EQUIPMENT FINANCING

ALLIEGIANT

CAL-LINE EQUIPMENT INC. A

TRUECO INC.

ALLIEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONOVAN THOMAS M.

DONOVAN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

5/6/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/21/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

3/29/2019: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Amended Complaint

2/25/2019: Amended Complaint

Notice

2/14/2019: Notice

Notice

2/14/2019: Notice

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/31/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

2/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons

12/3/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date Ater Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why Sanctions should not be imposed on plaintiff for failure to comply with the rules and orders of the Court.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 5:49 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action); Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Complaint (1st); Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Your Way Tree Service, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allegiant Partners Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where True is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONOVAN THOMAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONOVAN THOMAS M. ESQ.