This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 00:12:21 (UTC).

YOUR MOVERS, A CALIFORNIA CLOSELY HELD CORPORATION VS MARIE Y LEMELLE

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 YOUR MOVERS, A CALIFORNIA CLOSELY HELD CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIE Y LEMELLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0409

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUR MOVERS A CALIFORNIA CLOSELY HELD CORPORATION

Defendant

LEMELLE MARIE Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/23/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

6/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Your Movers, a California closely held corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Your Movers, a California closely held corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Your Movers, a California closely held corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Your Movers, a California closely held corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Your Movers, a California closely held corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH WIND