Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 06:52:12 (UTC).

YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION VS. CITY OF MAYWOOD

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CITY OF MAYWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6796

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF MAYWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OLIVAREZ MADRUGA LEMIEUX O'NEILL LLP

MADRUGA ESQ. THOMAS MATTHEW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MONTGOMERY MICHAEL B.

ACKER ESQ. STEPHEN

MONTGOMERY ESQ. MICHAEL BRUCE

CECCON ROBERT

ACKER & WHIPPLE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

1/18/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/5/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

2/13/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Answer

2/16/2018: Answer

Unknown

2/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/4/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

6/12/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

6/20/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

7/19/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

7/19/2018: Unknown

Motion to Compel

10/19/2018: Motion to Compel

Other -

10/19/2018: Other -

Other -

10/19/2018: Other -

Other -

10/19/2018: Other -

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice (Of Rescheduled Hearing On Young Mens Christian Association Of Metropolitan Los Angeles Four Motions To Compel Further Responses From City Of Maywood); Filed by YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Request for Admissions, Set One Propounded on City of Maywood) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Motion (FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECL OF JUAN DE LA CRUZ, VICTOR DOMINGUEZ AND PATRICIA RENTERIA IN SUPPORT OF; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Motion; Filed by YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CITY OF MAYWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTGOMERY MICHAEL B.