This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 20:32:05 (UTC).

YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF THE FOOTHILLS VS JAY L. SCHIEFFELIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF THE FOOTHILLS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAY L SCHIEFFELIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES R. DUNN and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4019

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES R. DUNN

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF THE FOOTHILLS

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

SCHIEFFELIN JAY L.

VILLAGE PEOPLE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

SCHIEFFELIN EMMA R.

ALL PERSONS

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF JAY L. SCHIEFFELIN AND EMMA R. SCHIEFFELIN

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN

VILLAGE PEOPLE HOMEONWERS ASSOCIATION

JAIN NIRMAL R.

JAIN NEENA

SEONG JOHN WEON

SEONG EUNRAE

BRIAN ANDREW MCGOLDRICK AND EMILY MICHELLE MCGOLDRICK TRUSTEES OF THE BRIAN & MICHELLE MCGOLDRICK 2103 TRUST

LEE JEUNG SOOK

SEONG VIN

LEE SOOK JA

SEONG JACOB UN

LEE JAMES CHIL SUNG

VICTOR M. GARCIA AND ANA L. VIZCARRA TRUSTEES OF THE VICTOR M. GARCIA AND ANA L. VIZCARRA LIVING TRUST UTD

ADLER MARK

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

BRIAN ANDREW MCGOLDRICK AND EMILY MICHELLE MCGOLDRICK TRUSTEES OF THE BRIAN & MICHELLE MCGOLDRICK 2103 TRUST

LEE JEUNG SOOK

VICTOR M. GARCIA AND ANA L. VIZCARRA TRUSTEES OF THE VICTOR M. GARCIA AND ANA L. VIZCARRA LIVING TRUST UTD

ADLER MARK

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BUCHANAN BRIAN FRENCH

MAHLER SCOTT B

Defendant, Not Classified By Court and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BRENNER ANITA SUSAN

COE LISA ANNE

MOSS BRIDGET

CHUCK STEPHEN C.

BUCHANAN BRIAN FRENCH

MCDONALD RICHARD A.

MOSS BRIDGET M

SANDS EUGENE P

MOSS BRIDGET M.

MAHLER SCOTT B

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COE LISA ANNE

CHUCK STEPHEN C.

CHUCK STEPHEN C

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorney

BRENNER ANITA SUSAN

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED

7/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

4/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Request for Judicial Notice

5/3/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/3/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Ruling

3/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/2/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, AGAINST DEFENDANT

12/2/2020: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, AGAINST DEFENDANT

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AGAINST DEFENDANTS JAY AND EMMA SCHIEFFELIN, THEIR SUCCES

10/2/2020: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AGAINST DEFENDANTS JAY AND EMMA SCHIEFFELIN, THEIR SUCCES

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

7/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/2/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

3/12/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/22/2019

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/22/2019

Objection - Objection Plaintiffs Notice Of Objections To Village People Homeowners Association's Three Reply Filings Regarding The Motion To Intervene

2/15/2019: Objection - Objection Plaintiffs Notice Of Objections To Village People Homeowners Association's Three Reply Filings Regarding The Motion To Intervene

359 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
491 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Reid Samuelson in Support of Ex Parte Application for Publication); Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order of Publication of Summons); Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Zach Grant in Support of Ex Parte Application for Publication); Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Brian F. Buchanan Re: Notice in Support of Ex Parte Application for Publication); Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint (2nd); Filed by Young Men's Christian Association of the Foothills (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF PAWLO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COE LISA ANNE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUCK STEPHEN C.