This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 01:13:27 (UTC).

YOUNG KOOK CHO VS JOHN MCEWAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by YOUNG KOOK CHO against JOHN MCEWAN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7693

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHO YOUNG KOOK

Respondents and Defendants

MCEWAN JOHN

DOES 1-25

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

LYFT INC.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT LYFR, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/28/2018: DEFENDANT LYFR, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/6/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Legacy Document

7/12/2018: Legacy Document

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/7/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR

Order

10/25/2018: Order

Other -

10/26/2018: Other -

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/12/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

3/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

Objection

4/11/2019: Objection

Certificate of Mailing for

4/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/18/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Motion

5/29/2019: Notice of Motion

SUMMONS

3/12/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

3/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Attendance and Testimony of Lyft Inc. PMK at Deposition) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice of Motion (and Motion for Order Compelling Attendance and Testimony of Lyft Inc.'s Person Most Qualified and for Order Imposing Sanctions); Filed by Young Kook Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Defendant John McEwan's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by John McEwan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by John McEwan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 3:00 PM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Young Kook Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Young Kook Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Young Kook Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Young Kook Cho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697693    Hearing Date: May 01, 2020    Dept: SWB

Court's tentative ruling is to grant continuance as requested. All pre trial cutoffs will conform to the new trial date. Parties will be ordered to an MSC downtown (when the program resumes).Clerk will determine exact date and send out minute order.If no party opposes this ruling, no appearance via courtcall is required.