Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2020 at 16:07:33 (UTC).

YOUNG IL AN, ET AL. VS JOHN DOE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 YOUNG IL AN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN DOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9351

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AN YOUNG IL

KANG JOYCE

Defendants

TODD PIPE & SUPPLY LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORLEY BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLVD 6200 OWNER LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOE JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINDLER ALAN F.

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON ERIC L.

MICHAEL CHRISTINA F.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/22/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/7/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/7/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

6/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

PI General Order

5/26/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TODD PIPE & SUPPLY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by TODD PIPE & SUPPLY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BLVD 6200 OWNER, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MORLEY BUILDERS, INC. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by BLVD 6200 OWNER, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MORLEY BUILDERS, INC. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BLVD 6200 OWNER, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MORLEY BUILDERS, INC. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YOUNG IL AN (Plaintiff); JOYCE KANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YOUNG IL AN (Plaintiff); JOYCE KANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YOUNG IL AN (Plaintiff); JOYCE KANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YOUNG IL AN (Plaintiff); JOYCE KANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YOUNG IL AN (Plaintiff); JOYCE KANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YOUNG IL AN (Plaintiff); JOYCE KANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TODD PIPE AND SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINDLER ALAN F. ESQ.