Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 00:03:29 (UTC).

YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC VS YONG SUK JUN

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against YONG SUK JUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0483

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC

JUN YONG SUK

ROES 1 THROUGH 25

YOUNG HYUN TRADING CO. LTD.

J & P YARN ENTERPRISES INC.

RICHAROAD USA INC.

HWANG THOMAS

YOUNG HYUN TRADING CO. LTD

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JUN YONG SUK

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARH DAVID ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEE FRANK N. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/27/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF RULING

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/3/2018: Minute Order

CROSS-COMPLAT BY YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL, INC. FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

11/7/2017: CROSS-COMPLAT BY YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL, INC. FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

DEFENDAT YONG SUK JUN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/21/2017: DEFENDAT YONG SUK JUN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT (JOINT VENTURE AGREEMENT); ETC.

9/21/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT (JOINT VENTURE AGREEMENT); ETC.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/22/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

SUMMONS

7/31/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CONVERSION 2. CLAIM & DELIVERY 3. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

7/31/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CONVERSION 2. CLAIM & DELIVERY 3. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

8/2/2017: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Minute Order

8/2/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULINGS

8/3/2017: NOTICE OF RULINGS

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 57; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 57; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Young Hyun International Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Yong Suk Jun (Legacy Party); J & P Yarn Enterprises Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 85; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SIMON H. LANGER RE NOTICE OF EX PANE RE CLAIM & DELIVERY WRIT AND TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-07-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR EX PARTE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CONVERSION 2. CLAIM & DELIVERY 3. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE FRANK N.