This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 22:32:09 (UTC).

YOUNATAN SAMOUHA VS KAMYAR ANSARI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 YOUNATAN SAMOUHA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAMYAR ANSARI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8887

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMOUHA YOUNATAN

Defendants

ANSARI KAMYAR

BOTANIQUE MEMBERS CLUB

OHANA TAL

CRYSTAL INVESTMENTS LLC

MASSACHI ALBERT

LEON GROUP DOE 2

STRANGER THAN US LLC DOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOHANBASH JOSHUA R.

Defendant Attorneys

BITTON OPHIR JACOB

DIBA KASEY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/21/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/21/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/21/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/24/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/22/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/23/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/7/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

6/9/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/9/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2024
  • Hearing06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2023
  • Hearing12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant); Service Cost: 135.00; Service Date: 02/22/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Stranger Than Us LLC (DOE 3) (Defendant); Service Cost: 155.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 04/19/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Younatan Samouha on 09/22/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Younatan Samouha as to Crystal Investments, LLC and Albert Massachi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Investments, LLC (Defendant); Albert Massachi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Stranger Than Us LLC (DOE 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): As To Parties changed from Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant) to Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Kamyar Ansari (Defendant); Tal Ohana (Defendant); Botanique Members Club (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Kamyar Ansari (Defendant); Tal Ohana (Defendant); Botanique Members Club (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Kamyar Ansari (Defendant); Tal Ohana (Defendant); Botanique Members Club (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less