*******8887
06/09/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Los Angeles, California
SAMOUHA YOUNATAN
ANSARI KAMYAR
BOTANIQUE MEMBERS CLUB
OHANA TAL
CRYSTAL INVESTMENTS LLC
MASSACHI ALBERT
LEON GROUP DOE 2
STRANGER THAN US LLC DOE 3
KOHANBASH JOSHUA R.
DIBA KASEY
BITTON OPHIR JACOB
2/21/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
2/21/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
2/21/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
1/24/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
12/22/2022: Answer
11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service
11/23/2022: Answer
10/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
9/22/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
7/7/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
7/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/9/2022: Complaint
6/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet
6/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
6/9/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
6/9/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE
6/9/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS
6/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Hearing06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
[-] Read LessHearing12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Stranger Than Us LLC (DOE 3) (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): As To Parties changed from Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant) to Leon Group (DOE 2) (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: Tal Ohana (Defendant); As to: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Tal Ohana (Defendant); Service Date: 10/29/2022; Service Cost: 555.87; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: Crystal Investments, LLC (Defendant); Albert Massachi (Defendant); As to: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Kamyar Ansari (Defendant); Tal Ohana (Defendant); Botanique Members Club (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff); As to: Kamyar Ansari (Defendant); Tal Ohana (Defendant); Botanique Members Club (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Younatan Samouha (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
[-] Read Less