This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2021 at 12:00:44 (UTC).

YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC, ET AL. VS AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1324

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOU GIVE ME LIFE INC

OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP

Defendants

AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAUER ALYSSA M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ORDER

11/19/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ORDER

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/3/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

12/16/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 01/19/2021

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

Notice of Settlement

1/19/2021: Notice of Settlement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 3:23 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...) of 01/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint And [proposed] Order); Filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ORDER); Filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Joint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint); Filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YOU GIVE ME LIFE, INC (Plaintiff); OTHER PLACES DRAMA LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less