This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 18:35:38 (UTC).

YOSEF CHAIM NOUROLLAH VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 YOSEF CHAIM NOUROLLAH filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0635

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOUROLLAH YOSEF CHAIM

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASHANI JACOB KAHEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/12/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/12/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yosef Chaim Nourollah (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, a Limited Liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/13/2023; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Yosef Chaim Nourollah (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, a Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Yosef Chaim Nourollah (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, a Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yosef Chaim Nourollah (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, a Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less