This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:29:29 (UTC).

YOON MA VS AGASSI GOPCHANG, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 YOON MA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AGASSI GOPCHANG, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7567

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MA YOON

Defendant

AGASSI GOPCHANG LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM BRIANA M.

Defendant Attorney

RUSSELL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/22/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Dismiss

11/22/2021: Motion to Dismiss

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBIN LANDRUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

11/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBIN LANDRUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW W. RUSSELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

11/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW W. RUSSELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Agassi Gopchang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Robin Landrum in Support of Motion to Dismiss); Filed by Agassi Gopchang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Agassi Gopchang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Andrew W. Russell in Support of Motion to Dismiss); Filed by Agassi Gopchang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Filed by Agassi Gopchang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Yoon Ma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Yoon Ma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Agassi Gopchang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yoon Ma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yoon Ma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yoon Ma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSELL ANDREW