This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2022 at 20:09:44 (UTC).

YOON KYUNG RHEE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 YOON KYUNG RHEE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6919

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHEE AN INDIVIDUAL YOON KYUNG

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

11/22/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

11/22/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2024
  • Hearing11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2024
  • Hearing05/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2024
  • Hearing05/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: YOON KYUNG RHEE, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by: YOON KYUNG RHEE, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: YOON KYUNG RHEE, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: YOON KYUNG RHEE, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.