This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2023 at 02:12:13 (UTC).

YONG PAK, ET AL. VS GT MADISON REALTY LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 YONG PAK, filed an Other lawsuit against GT MADISON REALTY LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4640

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAK SUN YOUNG

PAK YONG

Defendants

OAK PARK MANOR LP

GT MADISON REALTY LLC DBA OAK PARK MANOR LP

MADISON REALTY EQUITIES LLC

QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Not Classified By Court

DONELL STEPHEN J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHARIBIAN ART

Defendant Attorneys

STEWART MEREDITH DAWN

DAILO EDWARD P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Order

12/17/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OAK PARK MANOR, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY, LLCS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF AMBER M. THAM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/5/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OAK PARK MANOR, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY, LLCS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF AMBER M. THAM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUN YONG PAK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OAK PARK MANOR, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY, LLCS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

10/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUN YONG PAK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OAK PARK MANOR, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY, LLCS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COURT MINUTE ORDER STAYING ACTION AGAINST QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

10/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COURT MINUTE ORDER STAYING ACTION AGAINST QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Management Statement

10/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OAK PARK MANOR, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY, LLCS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JENNIFER LIEFV

10/13/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OAK PARK MANOR, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY, LLCS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JENNIFER LIEFV

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/20/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Other - - RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

10/20/2021: Other - - RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/4/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

11/16/2021: Answer

Answer

11/24/2021: Answer

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by YONG PAK, et al. on 02/05/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by YONG PAK and SUN YOUNG PAK as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: YONG PAK (Plaintiff); SUN YOUNG PAK (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 09/26/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAddress for Art Gharibian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: YONG PAK (Plaintiff); SUN YOUNG PAK (Plaintiff); As to: GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF SUN YONG PAK (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO YONG PAK PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32); Filed by: YONG PAK (Plaintiff); SUN YOUNG PAK (Plaintiff); As to: GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: YONG PAK (Plaintiff); SUN YOUNG PAK (Plaintiff); As to: GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: YONG PAK (Plaintiff); SUN YOUNG PAK (Plaintiff); As to: GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: *******4640 Hearing Date: October 20, 2021 Dept: 61

Defendants GT Madison Realty, LLC, and Oak Park Manor, LP’s Motion to Compel Arbitration is DENIED.

I. MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

On petition of a party to an arbitration agreement to arbitrate a controversy, a court must order the petitioner and respondent to arbitrate the controversy if it determines the arbitration agreement exists, unless (1) the petitioner has waived its right to arbitrate; (2) grounds exist for the revocation of the agreement; or (3) “[a] party to the arbitration agreement is also a party to a pending court action or special proceeding with a third party, arising out of the same transaction or series of related transactions and there is a possibility of conflicting rulings on a common issue of law or fact.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 1281.2.)

“[T]he party moving to compel arbitration bears the burden of establishing the existence of a valid agreement to arbitrate, and the party opposing arbitration bears the burden of proving by a preponderance of the evidence any fact necessary to its defense. The role of the trial court is to sit as a trier of fact, weighing any affidavits, declarations, and other documentary evidence, together with oral testimony received at the court's discretion, to reach a determination on the issue of arbitrability.” (Hotels Nevada v. L.A. Pacific Center, Inc. (2006) 144 Cal.App.4th 754, 758.)

Defendants present an arbitration agreement executed by Plaintiff on behalf of Decedent within the facility admissions agreement on August 11, 2020. (Motion Exh. 1.) The agreement applies to “any controversy or claim arising out of or relating to this contract, or the breach thereof.” (Motion Exh. 1 at p. 16.) The agreement is authenticated by Jennifer Liefveld, who was the interim administrator for Defendant Oak Park Manor, LP, and who delivered the agreement to Plaintiff and executed it. (Liefyeld Decl. ¶¶ 4–5.)

Plaintiff objects to the agreement on a number of bases. First, Plaintiff notes that the space for the signature of the facility’s representative is not present on the agreement, and the admission agreement is missing one of its opening pages, which may define its parties. (Opposition at pp. 6–9.) Plaintiff further argues that the scope of the agreement, which applies to claims arising out of the contract, does not encompass the present elder abuse and wrongful death action. (Opposition at pp. 9–10.) Plaintiff also notes that she signed the agreement only as a representative of Decedent, and cannot be compelled to arbitrate her own claims, meaning that the request for arbitration must be denied for risk of inconsistent rulings under Code of Civil Procedure ; 1281.2. (Opposition at pp. 11–12.) Plaintiff finally argues that the agreement is unconscionable and unlawful under Health & Safety Code ; 1569.269. (Opposition at pp. 12–17.)

Plaintiffs’ arguments are persuasive. First, enforcing the arbitration agreement executed between Oak Manor and Decedent carries an unacceptable risk of conflicting rulings on common issues of law and fact with those claims not subject to the agreement under Code of Civil Procedure ; 1281.2, subd. (c). That statute provides, “A party to the arbitration agreement is also a party to a pending court action or special proceeding with a third party, arising out of the same transaction or series of related transactions and there is a possibility of conflicting rulings on a common issue of law or fact.” (Code Civ. Proc. ; 1281.2, subd. (c).)

Here, there exist claims as to third parties to the arbitration agreement, namely all Plaintiffs’ claims against GT Madison Realty, LLC, and Plaintiff’s claims against both Defendants. This is because GT Madison is not named as a party to the arbitration agreement, and Liefveld, whose testimony authenticates the agreement, testifies only that she is employed by Defendant Oak Park Manor, LP and executed the agreement on that Defendant’s behalf. (Liefveld Decl. ¶¶ 1–5.) Defendants in reply attempt to argue that GT is actually a party to the agreement because a previously omitted page of the agreement defines “facility” to include “the operator of the facility,” and because GT is alleged and licensed to operate Defendant Oak Park Manor. (Reply at pp. 4–5.) But the inclusion of this potential reference to GT in the agreement does not mean that GT is actually a party to the contract, particularly as Liefveld does not allege that the agreement was presented or executed on behalf of GT.

Even if the contract could be construed to include GT as a party, it would only extend to Decedent’s claims, not to Plaintiff’s, thus creating the risk of conflicting rulings that Code of Civil Procedure ; 1281.2 is designed to prevent. The case of Daniels v. Sunrise Senior Living, Inc. (2013) 212 Cal.App.4th 674, is directly on point. There, the court of appeal upheld a trial court decision denying a motion to compel arbitration under Code of Civil Procedure ; 1281.2, subd. (c), based on the arbitrability of a survivor cause of action but not a successor’s wrongful death action. (Id. at pp. 686-687.) When the defendant argued that the existence of non-arbitrable claims did not obviate the arbitrability of other claims, the court rejected this argument, reasoning that the plaintiff’s claims were not merely non-arbitrable, but that plaintiff was a third party to the agreement under section 1281.2. (Id. at p. 687.) That case specifically distinguished the very authority that Defendants rely upon here to justify enforcing the arbitration agreement. (Ibid.; Reply at p. 6.) Accordingly, this court may decline to enforce the arbitration agreement under Code of Civil Procedure ; 1281.2.[1]

Furthermore, Plaintiff persuasively argues that the arbitration agreement at issue is illegal under Health & Safety Code ; 1569.269. (Opposition at pp. 15–16. That statute enumerates rights held by residents of residential care facilities, such as those run by Defendants (Complaint ¶ 3), and contains the following subsection:

No provision of a contract of admission, including all documents that a resident or his or her representative is required to sign as part of the contract for, or as a condition of, admission to a residential care facility for the elderly, shall require that a resident waive benefits or rights to which he or she is entitled under this chapter or provided by federal or other state law or regulation.

(Health & Safety Code ; 1569.269, subd. (c).)

Plaintiff cites decisions in which similar statutes were held to prohibit the application of arbitration agreements. (See Harris v. University Village Thousand Oaks, CCRC, LLC (2020) 49 Cal.App.5th 847, 852–853 [holding that arbitration agreement in residential lease agreement violated Civil Code ; 1953, which prohibits waiver of procedural litigation rights in such leases].) Since the right to jury trial in civil actions is a right to which Decedent was entitled under federal and state law, it was unlawful to require a waiver of this right as a condition to Decedent’s admission into the facility. Defendants in reply argue only that arbitration agreements are generally lawful, and make no reference to this particular statute. (Reply at pp. 7–8.)

Accordingly, the motion to compel arbitration is DENIED.


[1] Defendants briefly argue that the Federal Arbitration Act (FAA) governs this arbitration agreement, owing to the facility’s operation in interstate commerce. (Motion at pp. 6–7.) This argument does not affect the applicability of Code of Civil Procedure ; 1281.2, subd. (c), because “[t]he procedural aspects of the FAA do not apply in state court absent an express provision in the arbitration agreement.” (Avila v. Southern California Specialty Care, Inc. (2018) 20 Cal.App.5th 835, 840.) Here, the arbitration agreement not only does not mention the FAA (except in the context of vacating an arbitration award), but expressly incorporates the procedures of the California Code of Civil Procedure ; 1280, et seq. (Motion Exh. 1 at p. 16.)

"