This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 03:51:51 (UTC).

YONG HWAN KIM ET AL VS SIMCO CONSTRUCTION ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 YONG HWAN KIM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIMCO CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5731

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM YONG HWAN

KIM HAENG CHA

Defendants

SIMCO CONSTRUCTION

NAMU DEVELOPMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON COBURN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

KRING & CHUNG LLP

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; ORDER

2/27/2018: STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; ORDER

Minute Order

8/22/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

Case Management Statement

5/20/2019: Case Management Statement

NOTICE OF RULING RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

11/28/2017: NOTICE OF RULING RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order

11/17/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/26/2017: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/16/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/20/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/26/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

10/30/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/11/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

SUMMONS

3/28/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE (CONSTRUCTION DEFECT)

3/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE (CONSTRUCTION DEFECT)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

4/4/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

4/11/2017: SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Namu Development, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Yong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff); Haeng Cha Kim (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Yong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff); Haeng Cha Kim (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketSupplemental Proof of Service; Filed by Yong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff); Haeng Cha Kim (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Yong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff); Haeng Cha Kim (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Yong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff); Haeng Cha Kim (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE (CONSTRUCTION DEFECT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff); Haeng Cha Kim (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5731    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: 74

****5731 YONG HWAN KIM ET AL VS SIMCO CONSTRUCTION ET AL

Plaintiff’s Unopposed Motion to Deem Matters Admitted and for Sanctions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are awarded sanctions in the amount of $600, against Chae Chul Sim dba Simco Construction, payable within 15 days. The court sets an OSC re striking the answer filed by Chae Chul Sim dba Simco Construction for failure to obtain counsel on March 19, 2020 at 8:30. Moving party to give notice.

On August 23, 2018, the court deemed related and consolidated cases ****5731 and BC593197, with BC593197 as the lead case. This order shall be entered in both cases.

The court finds defendant’s failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions have been sufficiently noticed. However, the court reduces the hourly rate ($670) and hours spent preparing this motion (2 hours) because both are unreasonable in light of counsel’s experience and the simplicity of this unopposed motion. (Kim Decl. ¶ 15.) The Court awards no time for reviewing an opposition and preparing a reply because there was no opposition. The Court finds one hour in appearance time is reasonable.

Accordingly, the court grants sanctions for a total of 2 hours to prepare the motion and appear at the hearing, at $300.00 per hour, plus one $60 filing fee, for a total of $660.