This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 02:08:34 (UTC).

YONATAN AYAL, ET AL. VS AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 YONATAN AYAL, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0681

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AYAL YONATAN

MAYLON LAUREN

Defendants

AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

ZERNIK JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPURLEY REGINA

Defendant Attorney

LAURENCE PATRICK MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/20/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

9/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/29/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/26/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff); As to: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant); Service Date: 06/29/2022; Service Cost: 49.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Yonatan Ayal, et al. on 05/20/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Yonatan Ayal and Lauren Maylon as to Jack Zernik

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff); As to: Jack Zernik (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); As to: Jack Zernik (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/20/2022; Service Cost: 164.42; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff); As to: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant); Jack Zernik (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff); As to: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant); Jack Zernik (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Yonatan Ayal (Plaintiff); Lauren Maylon (Plaintiff); As to: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Defendant); Jack Zernik (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPURLEY REGINA ASHKINADZE