This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 01:44:39 (UTC).

YOLANDA VARGAS VS GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 YOLANDA VARGAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6625

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS YOLANDA

Defendants

WEB DEL

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOTTILE TIMOTHY B. ESQ.

CACCIATORE THOMAS P.

Defendant Attorneys

KINAGA PATRICIA A. ESQ.

WALASIK KATRINA J.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/25/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/9/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/9/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Motion for Order

10/26/2018: Motion for Order

Motion for Order

10/26/2018: Motion for Order

Minute Order

10/26/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/26/2018: Ex Parte Application

Proof of Service by Mail

10/29/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Ex Parte Application

3/21/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/26/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

3/26/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Ruling

3/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel

4/26/2019: Motion to Compel

Declaration

4/26/2019: Declaration

Unknown

11/17/2017: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/4/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

12/4/2017: Minute Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2019

DocketDeclaration (OF VICTORIA V. FELDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF YOLANDA VARGASS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS); Filed by Yolanda Vargas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2019

DocketMotion to Compel (PLAINTIFF YOLANDA VARGAS?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DEL WEB AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS); Filed by Yolanda Vargas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant); Del Web (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Yolanda Vargas (Plaintiff); Golden State Water Company (Defendant); Del Web (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Golden State Water Company and Del Webb...)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2019

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2019

DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Pr...)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019

DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial); Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant); Del Web (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2019

Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
07/25/2017

DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOLANDA VARGAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2017

DocketAnswer; Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2017

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2017

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2017

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2017

DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yolanda Vargas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

DocketComplaint; Filed by Yolanda Vargas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. SEXUAL HARASSMENT (HOSTILE WORK ENVIRONMENT) IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2017

DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Yolanda Vargas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****6625 Hearing Date: August 6, 2021 Dept: 48

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

On June 7, 2021, Plaintiff Yolanda Vargas filed a motion to compel the depositions of Byron Rozul, Kenneth Vecherelli, Angel Marquez, Lucy Aguilar, Norma Valdez, and Defendant Golden State Water Company’s PMK. Plaintiff states she noticed the depositions of these witnesses but they failed to appear, and Defendant has not provided alternate deposition dates. Plaintiff states that the individuals are subject to the control of Defendant. Plaintiff’s counsel’s declaration states the deposition notices are attached, but in fact no notices are attached.

Defendant filed a very late opposition two days before the hearing date. Defendant blames Plaintiff for the failure to schedule Defendant’s depositions.

This case is now more than four years old. The depositions should have been completed years ago.

The motion to compel the depositions is GRANTED. To the extent Byron Rozul, Kenneth Vecherelli, Angel Marquez, Lucy Aguilar, and Norma Valdez are employees, officers, directors, or agents of Defendant, Defendant is to make them available for depositions. In addition, Defendant is to make the PMK witness available for a deposition on the topics in the PMK deposition notice. Counsel are ordered to meet and confer on the phone within the next five days to schedule these depositions. If they cannot agree on dates, Plaintiff is to immediately notice the depositions to take place before September 10, 2021.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCDEPT48@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit. Parties intending to appear are STRONGLY encouraged to appear remotely.

'


Case Number: ****6625    Hearing Date: September 01, 2020    Dept: 48

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Plaintiff Yolanda Vargas served document requests on Defendant Golden State Water Company including request Nos. 24 and 25 seeking all documents referring to any investigation Defendant conducted into Angel Marquez and Del Webb. Plaintiff contends she complained about Marquez’ unlawful conduct against her, which Defendant investigated. Webb replaced Marquez and then allegedly engaged in unlawful conduct against Plaintiff.

Defendant objected that the requests are too broad because they are not limited to documents concerning investigations into Plaintiff’s complaints and would include investigations into complaints unrelated to the type of claims in this case. Defendant also objected that the requests seek attorney-client privileged and work product information.

The requests are broad enough to encompass investigations that do not appear relevant. For example, if Marquez or Webb were consistently late to work or stealing employer property, documents about investigations into those matters would not appear relevant or reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. But if other employees had complained about them engaging in gender discrimination or unfair discipline after returning from medical leave, the information could be relevant. Accordingly, the motion is granted as to Nos. 24 and 25, limited to responsive documents concerning investigations into complaints about Marquez or Webb from female employees or employees complaining about unfair discipline after returning from medical leave.

Responsive documents are to be produced within 15 days of the date of this order. Defendant is to produce a privilege log listing all responsive documents that it is withholding based on attorney-client privilege or work product within 15 days of the date of this order.

In sum, the motion is GRANTED IN PART. The request for sanctions is denied.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCDEPT48@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit. Parties intending to appear are STRONGLY encouraged to appear remotely.