This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 13:08:30 (UTC).

YOLANDA RIOS VS BROOKFIELD OFFICE PROPERTIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 YOLANDA RIOS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BROOKFIELD OFFICE PROPERTIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4675

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIOS YOLANDA

Defendants and Respondents

ABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

BROOKFIELD OFFICE PROPERTIES INC.

CROWN BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAZERKANIAN H. JACK ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BREMER KEITH G. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/6/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CoverSheet

9/14/2017: CoverSheet

Summons

9/14/2017: Summons

Complaint

9/14/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Yolanda Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Crown Building Maintenance Co. (Defendant); Able Building Maintenance (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yolanda Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Yolanda Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Yolanda Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKFIELD OFFICE PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAZERKANIAN H. JACK ESQ.