This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2022 at 07:10:07 (UTC).

YOLANDA DUNCAN VS DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 YOLANDA DUNCAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8211

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNCAN YOLANDA AKA YOLANDA B. KING AKA YOLANDA B. KING

Defendants

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC.

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

Not Classified By Court

U.S. BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNUM EDWIN ANTIGUA

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorney

YOON JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Judgment

1/27/2021: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE **DFLT P...)

1/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE **DFLT P...)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/27/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order - ORDER REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

6/29/2020: Order - ORDER REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH YOON RE DITECH'S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST AND U.S. BANK'S INTENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

1/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH YOON RE DITECH'S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST AND U.S. BANK'S INTENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

1/13/2021: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

8/17/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Case Management Statement

8/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Summary of the Case

6/29/2020: Summary of the Case

Proof of Service by Mail

6/29/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE **DFLT PKAGE IN E-COURT**; ORDER T...)

7/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE **DFLT PKAGE IN E-COURT**; ORDER T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE **DFLT PKAGE IN E-COURT**; ORDER T...) OF 07/30/2020

7/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE **DFLT PKAGE IN E-COURT**; ORDER T...) OF 07/30/2020

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/4/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

5/4/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/6/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion - Other (for Complaint in Intervention) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 16; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference (**Dflt Pkage in E-Court**) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) (Filed by Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder (Request for Entry of Court Judgment); Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Case Management Conference **Dflt P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JOSEPH YOON RE DITECH'S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST AND U.S. BANK'S INTENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION); Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Non-Party); DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yolanda Duncan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beneficial California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC is a litigant