This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 02:24:59 (UTC).

YOLANDA CURIEL, ET AL. VS KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 YOLANDA CURIEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6680

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CURIEL YOLANDA

DAVOODI NATAN

Defendants

KIA DOWNTOWN LOS ANGELES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KIA MOTORS AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KIA OF CARSON A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVOODI NATAN ESQ.

DAVOODI NATAN

Defendant Attorney

BRUCE-CHINERY JACQUELINE ADOLEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

12/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/3/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Motion

2/3/2022: Notice of Motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

1/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

5/5/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIEK

5/5/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIEK

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/17/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • Hearing08/31/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Hearing08/12/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Motion to Striek); Filed by YOLANDA CURIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Demurrer); Filed by YOLANDA CURIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 62; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation, (Defendant); KIA DOWNTOWN LOS ANGELES, a California Corporation, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YOLANDA CURIEL (Plaintiff); NATAN DAVOODI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YOLANDA CURIEL (Plaintiff); NATAN DAVOODI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YOLANDA CURIEL (Plaintiff); NATAN DAVOODI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by YOLANDA CURIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6680 Hearing Date: May 18, 2022 Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

YOLANDA CURIEL,

Plaintiff(s),

v.

KIA AMERICA, INC., et al ,

Defendant(s).

Case No.: *******6680

DISCLOSURE AND ORDER

Judge Beaudet hereby discloses that approximately 22 years ago, she and her husband purchased a pickup truck for her husband’s use that he recalls was either a Dodge or Chrysler pickup; Judge Beaudet does not remember the maker of the pickup. The pickup developed electrical problems. Judge Beaudet’s husband took the pickup in to the dealer many times for the same electrical problem. The pickup was tested with some device while it was operating, and eventually, the manufacturer and the dealer agreed to take the pickup back and refund the purchase price. No litigation was involved. Judge Beaudet does not believe that her experience will cause her to be biased for or against either party. However, if you believe differently, you will have until Monday, June 6, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. to file and serve a verified statement of disqualification per section CCP 170.3(c)(1) (the “Statement”). If you do not file and serve a Statement, grounds for recusal will be deemed waived. The hearing on Defendant’s Demurrer and Motion to Strike and the Case Management Conference will be continued to Monday, June 6, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Department 50 unless both parties waive the right to file the Statement. Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this Disclosure to any new parties who are added to the case and to file proof of service of same promptly after service, with a courtesy copy delivered to Department 50. Any new party has 14 calendar days from the date of service to file and serve the Statement per section CCP 170.3.

DATED: May 17, 2022

Honorable Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIA OF CARSON is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHINERY JACQUELINE BRUCE