This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 02:10:18 (UTC).

YOLANDA AVALOS ET AL VS MICHAEL KELLY CASTRO MOORE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 YOLANDA AVALOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL KELLY CASTRO MOORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9443

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

COVINGTON BROCK

AVALOS YOLANDA

Respondents and Defendants

MOORE MICHAEL KELLY CASTRO

DOES 1 TO 10

MEDISCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ROBIN E PALEY

PALEY ROBIN ELIOT

Defendant Attorney

SCHWALBACH JON ROY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/10/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/10/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Declaration

4/10/2019: Declaration

Request for Dismissal

6/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

2/5/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

SUMMONS

1/9/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/9/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Yolanda Avalos (Plaintiff); Brock Covington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Trial Attorney); Filed by Michael Kelly Castro Moore (Defendant); Mediscan Diagnostic Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Mediscan Diagnostic Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Michael Kelly Castro Moore (Defendant); Mediscan Diagnostic Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Yolanda Avalos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yolanda Avalos (Plaintiff); Brock Covington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Yolanda Avalos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Yolanda Avalos (Plaintiff); Brock Covington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDSCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWALBACH JON R