This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:26:39 (UTC).

YOLANDA ARCE VS GIOVANNI D' AMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 YOLANDA ARCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GIOVANNI D' AMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON, JR. and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3300

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARCE YOLANDA

Defendants and Respondents

D'AMORE GIOVANNI

DOES 1 TO 100

INCOME ESTATES LLC

THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AIN FARRIS E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

9/24/2018: Request for Dismissal

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE THE CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING THE COMPLAINT DATED MARCH 12, 2018;

3/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE THE CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING THE COMPLAINT DATED MARCH 12, 2018;

Motion to Vacate

3/22/2018: Motion to Vacate

Minute Order

4/23/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2018: Notice of Settlement

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

2/8/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

2/22/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING

3/12/2018: CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING

Minute Order

2/22/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (BYSTANDER); AND (2) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

2/8/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (BYSTANDER); AND (2) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Yolanda Arce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Yolanda Arce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3; (Motion to Vacate; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Notice of Voiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Motion; Filed by Yolanda Arce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 44; (Hearing-Re:Court Fees; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (BYSTANDER); AND (2) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Yolanda Arce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Yolanda Arce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Farris E. Ain, Esq., SBN 228045

LAW OFFICES OF FARRIS AIN, APC . 269 W. Bonita Ave., Suite A

Claremont, California 91711-4784

Tel.: (909) 626-1166

Fax: (909) 766-1881

E-Mail: Farris@AinLaw.com FELE@ - §ugea:iar'caufi af @aui'flamia ~ Attorneys for Plaintiff, YOLANDA ARCE County of Los Angeles

FEB - 8 2018

Sherri R. Carter, Exegutive Officer/Clerk

- « By w%"‘b’ ——é‘ Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA ~ VancyAverez

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

YOLANDA ARCE, an individual; CASE NO.Plaintiff, V. COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: , (1) NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF

GIOVANNI D’AMORE; EMOTIONAL DISTRESS INCOME ESTATES, LLC; (BYST ANDER); AND

THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED (2) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

PARTNERSHIP; and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive;

Defendants.

Hommcremmn me— - o - s - - . N P 1

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A is a litigant

Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIN FARRIS ELIAS