This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2023 at 17:22:25 (UTC).

YIMEI WONG VS 1605 ARMCOST INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 YIMEI WONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1605 ARMCOST INC ,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK H. EPSTEIN, H. JAY FORD III and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1401

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK H. EPSTEIN

H. JAY FORD III

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG YIMEI

Defendants

HOA PREMIER MANAGEMENT LLC

1605 ARMCOST INC.

LEE JACQUELINE C.

PARKER SUNY

HOWARD JESSICA

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

1605 ARMCOST INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 - 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELTREE TARA LIN

Defendant Attorney

DAY DOUGLAS L

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ANZ ANDREA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

9/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

9/12/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO POLICIES PROCEDURES FOR JUDICLAL MSC

9/11/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO POLICIES PROCEDURES FOR JUDICLAL MSC

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS

9/8/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO POLICIES PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MSC

9/6/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO POLICIES PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MSC

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO POLICIES PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MSC

9/5/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO POLICIES PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MSC

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

8/29/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR JUDICIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE RECORDS UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION

8/28/2023: Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE RECORDS UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION

Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT OF THE PARTIES

8/23/2023: Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT OF THE PARTIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCING DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MANDATO...)

8/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCING DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MANDATO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCING DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MANDATO...) OF 08/25/2023

8/25/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCING DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MANDATO...) OF 08/25/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFE...)

8/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE E SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/17/2023

8/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE E SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/17/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE E SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE E SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/16/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/15/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2023

Hearing10/02/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

Hearing09/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

Hearing09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Hearing on Motion - Other For payment of Sanctions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketStipulation - No Order To Policies And Procedures For Judicial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff); As to: 1605 Armcost Inc., (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketMSC Timeslot scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 306

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketStipulation - No Order Stipulation to Policies Procedures for Judiclal MSC; Filed by: 1605 Armcost Inc., (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketOpposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Payment Of Sanctions; Filed by: 1605 Armcost Inc., (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketStipulation - No Order Stipulation to Policies Procedures for Judicial MSC; Filed by: 1605 Armcost Inc., (Defendant); As to: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketStipulation - No Order Stipulation to Policies Procedures for Judicial MSC; Filed by: 1605 Armcost Inc., (Defendant); As to: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
125 More Docket Entries
11/09/2020

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff); As to: 1605 Armcost Inc., (Defendant); HOA Premier Management, LLC (Defendant); Suny Parker (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yimei Wong (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less