This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2023 at 15:59:33 (UTC).

YIDA GAO, ET AL. VS ADAM B. STRUCK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 YIDA GAO, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADAM B STRUCK,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0555

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SAND HILL ADVISORS LLC

Defendants

STRUCK AHC SPECIAL OPPORTUNITY LLC

STRUCK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

VECTIO SPV LLC

STRUCK CAPITAL FUND GP LLC

PROBITAS SPV LLC

STRUCK ADAM B.

SC TECTUS SPV LLC

ZERO SERIES B SPV LLC

STRUCK HOCO LLC

DIVERGENCE DIGITAL CURRENCY GP LLC

SERICO SPV LLC

IGNIS SERIES B LLC

STRUCK OTI SPECIAL OPPORTUNITY LLC

STRUCK A43 LLC

STRUCK CAPITAL SPECIAL SITUATIONS MANAGEMENT LLC

STRUCK SCRATCH SERIES A LLC

STRUCK CAPITAL FUND II GP LLC

STRUCK PF SPECIAL OPPORTUNITY LLC

DIVERGENCE DIGITAL CURRENCY MANAGEMENT LLC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

STRUCK ADAM B.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHMIDT DENIS

Defendant Attorney

SIEGEL AMNON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

8/3/2021: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

Answer

6/29/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference re: Arbitration)

8/29/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference re: Arbitration)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/3/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/3/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice (name extension) of Court Order Continuing CMC

10/12/2022: Notice (name extension) of Court Order Continuing CMC

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference re: Arbitration)

10/4/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference re: Arbitration)

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)

2/3/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)

Substitution of Attorney

2/8/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Of Frank D. Rorie JR. In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration

7/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Of Frank D. Rorie JR. In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Of Adam B. Struk In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration

7/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Of Adam B. Struk In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/8/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Denis Shmidt in Support of Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants' Opposition to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Adam B. Struck's Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/21/2021: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Denis Shmidt in Support of Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants' Opposition to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Adam B. Struck's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Opposition (name extension) Opposition to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Adam B. Struck's Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/21/2021: Opposition (name extension) Opposition to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Adam B. Struck's Motion to Compel Arbitration

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketStatus Conference re: Arbitration scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Adam B. Struck on 06/01/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Adam B. Struck as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Adam B. Struck (Cross-Complainant); As to: Shima Capitol GP LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant); Yida Gao (Cross-Defendant); Shima Capitol Management LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketStatus Conference re: Arbitration scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Arbitration)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference re: Arbitration scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/23/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department I - Hon. Mark H. Epsteineffective 08/21/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketUpdated -- 08/29/2023 Status Conference re: Arbitration: Location changed from Department R to Department I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
06/01/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Adam B. Struck (Defendant); As to: Yida Gao (Plaintiff); Sand Hill Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff); Shima Capitol LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Adam B. Struck (Defendant); Struck Capital Management, LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Fund GP LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Fund II GP, LLC (Defendant); Divergence Digital Currency Management LLC (Defendant); Divergence Digital Currency GP LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Special Situations GP LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Special Situations Management LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Stage Agnostic GP LLC (Defendant); Struck Scratch LLC (Defendant); Struck Scratch Series B LLC (Defendant); Struck Scratch Series A LLC (Defendant); Ignis SPV LLC (Defendant); Ignis Series B LLC (Defendant); Probitas SPV LLC (Defendant); Vectio SPV LLC (Defendant); Zero SPV LLC (Defendant); Serico SPV LLC (Defendant); Struck PF Special Opportunity LLC (Defendant); Struck OTI Special Opportunity LLC (Defendant); SC Tectus SPV LLC (Defendant); Struck Hoco LLC (Defendant); Struck A43 LLC (Defendant); Struck AHC Special Opportunity LLC (Defendant); Zero Series B SPV LLC (Defendant); As to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2021

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 06/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/03/2021 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Yida Gao (Plaintiff); Sand Hill Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adam B. Struck (Defendant); Struck Capital Management, LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Fund GP LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yida Gao (Plaintiff); Sand Hill Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adam B. Struck (Defendant); Struck Capital Management, LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Fund GP LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Yida Gao (Plaintiff); Sand Hill Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adam B. Struck (Defendant); Struck Capital Management, LLC (Defendant); Struck Capital Fund GP LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less