This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2020 at 00:56:24 (UTC).

YICONG GAN, ET AL. VS JOHN A. MASE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 YICONG GAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN A MASE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0437

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUN YIREN

XU WENBIN

LIU YING

DAI MEIFANG

LUO HUI

QIANG WEI

GAN YICONG

WANG LINYU

ZENG XIAOYAN

XUE TAO

NING ZHONGJIAN

Defendants

HOLDINGS FEDERAL WAY PARENT LLC

INDUSTRIAL REALTY GROUP LLC

HOLDINGS FEDERAL WAY LLC

AMERICAN DEVELOPMENT CENTER LLC

MASE JOHN A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LU ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

GAMARNIK KEVIN DAVID JR

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/29/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Ruling

4/29/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCE HEARING ...)

4/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCE HEARING ...)

Request for Judicial Notice

4/9/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROHIT KAPURIA IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

4/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROHIT KAPURIA IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

4/9/2019: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

4/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

Declaration - DECLARATION OF YIXIONG CAO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

4/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF YIXIONG CAO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

4/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN D. GAMARNIK IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

4/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN D. GAMARNIK IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

4/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

4/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

3/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/21/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wei Qiang (Plaintiff); Linyu Wang (Plaintiff); Yiren Sun (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Yicong Gan (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff); Hui Luo (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF RICHARD KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF YIXIONG CAO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketOpposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ROHIT KAPURIA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by John A. Mase (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); American Development Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause); Filed by Yicong Gan (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff); Hui Luo (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yicong Gan (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff); Hui Luo (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yicong Gan (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff); Hui Luo (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yicong Gan (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff); Hui Luo (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less