Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 20:57:02 (UTC).

YESID USECHE VS AYLIN GHOOKHASSIAN

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 YESID USECHE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AYLIN GHOOKHASSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1588

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

USECHE YESID

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GHOOKHASSIAN AYLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEAU THOMAS P

Defendant Attorneys

NEHME ANTHONY

CARTER SANDRA D.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

5/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/17/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/22/2021: Cross-Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/8/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Aylin Ghookhassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Aylin Ghookhassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yesid Useche (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aylin Ghookhassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Aylin Ghookhassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yesid Useche (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yesid Useche (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yesid Useche (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER SANDRA D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEHME ANTHONY