This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:47:29 (UTC).

YESHISHE MANUKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. MINDY MASTERS

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by YESHISHE MANUKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL against MINDY MASTERS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8352

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANUKIAN YEGHISHE AN INDIVIDUAL

MANUKIAN YEGHISHE

Defendant

MASTERS MINDY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

5/16/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/5/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

6/19/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Rejection

11/6/2018: Notice of Rejection

Minute Order

11/19/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Writ of Execution

3/29/2019: Writ of Execution

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/9/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Ex Parte Application

4/9/2019: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

4/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition

4/17/2019: Opposition

Supplemental Declaration

4/19/2019: Supplemental Declaration

Declaration

5/7/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

6/14/2019: Minute Order

Writ - Return

6/21/2019: Writ - Return

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • Writ - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Hearing on Labor Commission Appeal (To Set Aside Default and/or Default Judgment filed on behalf of Defendant Mindy Masters) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment; Filed by YEGHISHE, MANUKIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Labor Commission Appeal To Set Aside Default and/o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Janette Mattson); Filed by MINDY MASTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Alan Shoemaker); Filed by MINDY MASTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Opposition (to Defendant's motion); Filed by YEGHISHE, MANUKIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Declaration (Defendant's supplemental declaration in support of motion to set aside default judgment and vacate writ of possession); Filed by MINDY MASTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Request for Refund / Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment; Filed by MINDY MASTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by YEGHISHE, MANUKIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC068352    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: NCD

TENTATIVE RULING

Calendar: 15

Date: 12/13/19

Case No. EC 068352 Trial Date: None Set

Case Name: Manukian, et al. v. Masters, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

[CCP §284, CRC 3.1362]

Moving Party: Daniel Samadi

Name of Client: Defendant Mindy Masters (No Opposition)

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Order permitting attorney to be relieved as attorney of record in this action

GROUNDS FOR MOTION:

Irreconcilable conflict between client and counsel

DECLARATION BY MOVING ATTORNEY [CRC 3.1362 (c),(d)]:

Reasons why motion is necessary: ok

Address recently confirmed (within last 30 days)

By telephone

PROPOSED ORDER (CRC 3.1362 (e)):

Address and phone number of client set forth: Ok

Proper warning: Ok

Future dates filled in: Ok

ANALYSIS:

The paperwork is in order, except counsel has failed to check box 5a on the Order. In addition, if any future date should be set at the hearing (there are evidently no future dates now set in this matter), such date should be included on the order.

RULING:

[No Opposition]

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED. Counsel is instructed to complete the Order to check box 5a.

Once the Order is complete, the court will sign the Order and counsel will be relieved effective upon the efiling of the proof of service of the signed order upon the client.